View catalogue details |
Born: 14 August 1885 [Adelaide, South Australia]
Died: 17 June 1947 [Adelaide, South Australia]
Motor manufacturer
Edward Wheewall Holden was the grandson of James Alexander Holden who immigrated to South Australia from Staffordshire, England, in 1852. JA Holden established a saddlery and leather goods business in King William Street, Adelaide, in 1856. His son, Henry James Holden, expanded the business - first into manufacturing horse-drawn carriages and then motorcycle sidecars and motor-body body trimming.
EW Holden graduated from Adelaide University in 1905 with a bachelor of science and joined the family business. During World War I the Australian government placed restrictions on the importation of car bodies and the Holden company went into partnership with an Australian supplier of Dodge vehicles to build car bodies. Holden designed the first prototype and when it proved successful Holden's Motor Body Builders (HMBB) was established as a component of the Holden company in 1918.
By 1923 HMBB was producing more than half of the national output of car bodies. In 1924 HMBB opened a new plant at Woodville and here, under Holden's direction, the latest technologies were adopted and a modern production line established. Production more than trebled with the new factory's techniques. HMBB struck a deal with General Motors to exclusively manufacture GM car bodies at the Woodville plant. HMBB suffered during the Depression and the two companies merged in 1931 to form General Motors- Holden's. Holden was appointed chairman of General Motors- Holden's and later managing director. He was replaced as managing director by Laurence Hartnett from General Motors in the UK in 1934 and gradually had less to do with the company.
Holden was an Adelaide city councillor for three years. From 1935 to 1947 he served as a Liberal member of the South Australian Legislative Council, consistently advocating for business and industry in the state. Holden remained active in industry, serving as board member or director of numerous companies. He was director of the Bank of Adelaide. Holden served as president of the South Australian Chamber of Commerce and the Chamber of Manufactures and also of the Associated Chambers of Manufactures of Australia. He became president of the National Safety Council through his concern about deaths caused by motor vehicle accidents.
1931-47: Chairman of General Motors- Holden's
August 1931-March 1934: Managing director of General Motors- Holden's
14 December 1935-10 January 1947: Member of the South Australian Legislative Council
1936-39: President of the SA Chamber of Manufactures
1939-45: honorary controller-general of army canteens; visited Australian troops overseas
1943: Sponsored the establishment of a chair of electrical and mechanical engineering at the University of Adelaide
1946: Made Knight Bachelor
Bebbington, Terry. 45 years of Holden, North Ryde, N.S.W. : Australian Pub. and Print Co., c1994
Buttfield, Nancy, Dame. So great a change : the story of the Holden family in Australia, Sydney : Ure Smith, 1979
Davis, Tony. The Holden heritage : 1948-1998, 8th ed, Port Melbourne, Vic. : Public Affairs Department, General Motors-Holden's Automotive, in association with : Blakehurst, N.S.W : Marque, 1998
National Portrait Gallery of Australia: Sir Edward Holden by Leslie Bowles